EP0230701 - Apparatus for transferring particles from one zone to another [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | ||
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states UOP INC. 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenwood, Arthur Raymond 8201 Elmore Street Niles Illinois 60648 / US | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1989/09] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1987/52] | Brock, Peter William UOP Processes International Corporation 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7LW / GB | ||
Former [1987/50] | Brock, Peter William UOP Processes International Corporation 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7LW / GB | ||
Former [1987/32] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300393.5 | 21.01.1986 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230701 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230701 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10G35/12, B01J8/12 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C10G35/12 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
B01J8/125 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00884 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Hinüberbringen von Teilchen aus einer Zone in eine andere | [1987/32] | English: | Apparatus for transferring particles from one zone to another | [1987/32] | French: | Appareillage pour transférer des particules d'une zone à une autre | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3652231 (GREENWOOD ARTHUR R, et al); | [A]US3907511 (FORBES JAMES T, et al); | [A]US4094817 (OLSON ROBERT K, et al); | [A]US4233268 (BORET ROGER, et al); | [A]EP0154492 (UOP INC [US]); | [A]EP0157891 (UOP INC [US]); | [E]US4567022 (GREENWOOD ARTHUR R [US]) |