EP0191564 - Shampoo composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Hajime 31-9, Meguro Honcho 5-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takaya, Susumu 20-1, Innai 3-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba / JP | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300452.9 | 23.01.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | JP19850012248 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: JP 1224885 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191564 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191564 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191564 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/075 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
Y10S424/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/34] | Title | German: | Shampoo-Zusammensetzung | [1986/34] | English: | Shampoo composition | [1986/34] | French: | Composition de shampooing | [1986/34] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 16.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59184299 ; | [Y]JP54134711 ; | [Y]JP7806439 ; | [X]EP0115888 (CRINOS INDUSTRIA FARMACO [IT]); | [Y]GB2140452 (LION CORP) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 14, April 1985, page 383, abstract no. 119422d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 184 299 (LION CORP.) 19-10-1984, & JP59184299 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 157 (C-68), 22nd December 1979, page 131 C 68; & JP-A-54 134 711 (LION YUSHI K.K.) 19-10-1979, & JP54134711 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 18, May 1978, page 314, abstract no. 126182w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-78 06 439 (LION FAT AND OIL CO., LTD) 20-01-1978, & JP7806439 A 00000000 |