EP0193284 - A method for detecting HTLV-III neutralizing antibodies in sera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield Virginia 22161 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield, Virginia 22161 / US | ||
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE Washington, DC 20002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guroff, Marjorie Robert 6116 Tilden Lane Rockville, MD 20852 / US | 02 /
Gallo, Robert Charles 8513 Thornden Terrace Bethesda, MD 20834 / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al F.J. Cleveland and Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al F.J. Cleveland and Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [1986/36] | Daley, Michael John F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300600.3 | 29.01.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850698588 | 05.02.1985 Original published format: US 698588 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193284 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193284 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/577 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/1054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Nachweis von HTLV-III neutralisierenden Antikörpern in Sera | [1986/36] | English: | A method for detecting HTLV-III neutralizing antibodies in sera | [1986/36] | French: | Procédé pour la détection d'anticorps neutralisant HTLV-III dans les sérums | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1991 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [YPD]WO8504903 (US HEALTH [US], et al) | [X] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 4, April 1985, no. 36659, Philadelphia, PA, US; K. NAGY et al.: "Detection of receptors and neutralizing antibodies of the human T cell leukemia virus by pseudotype method", & MAGY. ONKOL. 1985, 29(1), 11-18 | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, MEDICAL SCIENCES, vol. 81, no. 8, May 1984, pages 2886-89, US; P. CLAPMAN et al.: "Pseudotypes of human T-cell leukemia virus types 1 and 2: neutralization by patients' sera" | [Y] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 2, February 1981, no. 10890, Philadelphia, PA, US; J.M. MILLER et al.: "Comparison of 4 serologic tests for the detection of antibodies to bovine leukemia virus", & AM. J. VET. RES. 1981, 42(1), 5-8 | [Y] - SCIENCE, vol. 226, 26th October 1984, pages 451-453, Washington, DC; D.D. HO et al.: "HTLV-III in the semen and blood of a healthy homosexual man" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, vol. 159, April 1984, pages 1117-1131; T.J. PALKER et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies against human T cell leukemia-lymphoma virus (HTLV) p24 internal core protein" |