EP0203674 - Journal mounted rotary joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johnson Corporation 805 Wood Street Three Rivers Michigan 49093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states The Johnson Corporation 805 Wood Street Three Rivers Michigan 49093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Eldon D. 15557 Millard Road Three Rivers Michigan, 49093 / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 86300812.4 | 06.02.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | US19850739864 | 31.05.1985 Original published format: US 739864 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203674 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203674 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/08, F16L27/00, F26B13/00, F26B21/00 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
F26B13/183 (EP,US);
D21F5/028 (EP,US);
D21F5/10 (EP,US);
F16L27/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Auf einem Lagerzapfen befestigte Drehdichtung | [1986/49] | English: | Journal mounted rotary joint | [1986/49] | French: | Joint rotatif fixé sur un tourillon | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 31.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AU68991B [ ]; | FR2474637 [ ] (POHL LOUIS [DE]) |