EP0191621 - Dopamine-bêta-hydroxylase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Carl 1105 Sylvan Drive Haddon Heights New Jersey 08035 / US | 02 /
Kruse, Lawrence Ivan 646 Clinton Avenue Haddonfield New Jersey 08033 / US | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Waters, David Martin, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Waters, David Martin, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300898.3 | 10.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | US19850700234 | 11.02.1985 Original published format: US 700234 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191621 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191621 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/04, C07C161/04, C07C155/08, A61K31/41 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Dopamin-beta-hydrolase-Inhibitoren | [1986/34] | English: | Dopamine-bêta-hydroxylase inhibitors | [1986/34] | French: | Inhibiteurs dopamine-bêta-hydrolase | [1986/34] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/35] | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2113199 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 41, no. 10, 14th May 1976, pages 1875-1876 Washington, DC, US; G. L'ABBE et al.: "Synthesis of 1, 4 disubstituted tekanoline-5-thiones" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 41, no. 21, 15th October 1987, pages 3395-3399 Washington, DC, US; H.W. ALTLAND: "Smiles rearrangement of 2-tetrayolylthio-3-amino-pyridines" |