EP0192422 - Ventilating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.W. Simon Limited System Works Hatchmoor Industrial Estate Torrington Devon, EX38 7HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states R.W. Simon Limited System Works Hatchmoor Industrial Estate Torrington Devon, EX38 7HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudzik, Henryk 4 Small Holdings Old Mill Lane Forest Town Mansfield Nottingham NG19 0HB / GB | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Richard John Albert 44 Monmouth Street London WC2H 9EP / GB | [1988/44] |
Former [1986/35] | Gordon, Richard John Albert R.J. Gordon & Company 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300998.1 | 13.02.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | GB19850004205 | 19.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8504205 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192422 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192422 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/02, E06B7/06, F24F13/00, F24F13/18 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
F24F13/00 (EP,US);
E06B7/06 (EP,US);
F24F13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | Lüftungsvorrichtung | [1986/35] | English: | Ventilating apparatus | [1986/35] | French: | Dispositif d'aération | [1986/35] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/37] | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB714897 (GREENWOOD AIRVAC VENTILATION [GB], et al); | [A]FR712285 (FAGES ET VENE ETS) |