EP0191643 - Integration of a gene into a chromosome and controllable excision therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTECHNICA INTERNATIONAL, INC. 85 Bolton Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | For all designated states H.J. Heinz Company P.O. Box 57 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230-0057 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states BIOTECHNICA INTERNATIONAL, INC. 85 Bolton Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | ||
For all designated states H.J. HEINZ COMPANY World Headquarters 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balakrishnan, Ramaswamy Six Laverdure Circle Framingham Massachusetts 01701 / US | 02 /
Backman, Keith C. 200 Carlisle Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301000.5 | 13.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | US19850701091 | 13.02.1985 Original published format: US 701091 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191643 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191643 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191643 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90, C12N15/67 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/90 (EP,US);
C12P13/22 (EP,US);
Y10S435/849 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/34] | C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Integration eines Gens in ein Chromosom und dessen kontrollierter Ausschnitt | [1986/34] | English: | Integration of a gene into a chromosome and controllable excision therefrom | [1986/34] | French: | Intégration d'un gène dans un chromosome et découpage contrôlé de celui-ci | [1986/34] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 24.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 24.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Request for further processing for: | 06.03.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.1992 | CH | 13.05.1992 | LI | 13.05.1992 | SE | 13.05.1992 | [1993/03] |
Former [1992/52] | CH | 13.05.1992 | |
LI | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | CH | 13.05.1992 | |
LI | 13.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0080848 [ ] (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | EP0131843 [ ] (BIO TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORP [US]) | Examination | - Chemical abstracts, vol. 100, n° 23, 4th June 1984, page 131, abstract n° 186506f, Columbus, Ohio, US. B.H. Howard et al "I SV2, a plasmid cloning vector that can be stably integrated in Escherichia coli", & Exp. Manipulation Gene Expression, 1983, 137-53 | - Biotechnology, December 1984, pp. 1045-1049, New York, US. K. Backman et al "Use of synchronous site-specific recombination in vivo to regulate gene expression" | - Agricultural and biological chemistry, vol. 46, n° 1, January 1982, pp. 313-315, Tokyo, JP. E. Nakano et al "Construction of sleeper cloning vehicles for enzyme overproduction" | - Journal of biotechnology, vol. 5, n° 4, May 1987, pp. 237-253, Amsterdam, NL. S. Sugimoto et al "Hyperproduction of phenylalanine by Escherichia coli : aplication of a temperature-controllable expression vector carrying the repressor-promoter system of bacteriophage lambda" | - Molecular and general genetics, vol. 192, n° 1-2, 1983, page 87-94. E. Ljungquist et al "Properties and products of the clones int gene of bacteriophage P2" | - Molecular and general genetics, vol. 177, n° 1, 1979/80, pages 163-168. R. Pastrana et al "In vitro insertion of the lambda attachment site into the plasmid RP4" |