EP0193341 - Ink dot printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Tetsuro 3-36 Tomita-cho Mishima Shizuoka / JP | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301156.5 | 19.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | JP19850039605 | 28.02.1985 Original published format: JP 3960585 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193341 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193341 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/12 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
B41J2/06 (EP,US);
B41J27/00 (EP,US);
B41J2002/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/36] | Title | German: | Tintenpunktdrucker | [1986/36] | English: | Ink dot printer | [1986/36] | French: | Imprimante par points d'encre | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0042293 [ ] (EPSON CORP [JP], et al); | DE3417948 [ ] (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0179493 |