EP0192490 - Time-domain intensity normalization for fiber optic sensing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eldec Corporation P.O. Box 100 16700 13th Avenue West Lynnwood Washington 98037-8503 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states Eldec Corporation P.O. Box 100 16700 13th Avenue West Lynnwood Washington 98037-8503 / US | ||
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states Eldec Corporation P.O. Box 100 16700 13th Avenue West Lynnwood Washington 98036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindsey, Thomas A. 2350-218th Place S.W. Brier Washington 98036 / US | 02 /
Morton, Randall E. 10320-181st N.E. Redmond Washington 98052 / US | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301256.3 | 21.02.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | US19850704324 | 22.02.1985 Original published format: US 704324 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192490 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192490 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192490 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
G01D5/35303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | Zeitfeld-Intensitätsnormalisierung für Lichtfaserdetektor | [1986/35] | English: | Time-domain intensity normalization for fiber optic sensing | [1986/35] | French: | Normalisation de l'intensité en domaine de temps pour la détection de fibres optiques | [1986/35] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.1991 | BE | 12.06.1991 | CH | 12.06.1991 | LI | 12.06.1991 | NL | 12.06.1991 | SE | 12.06.1991 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/18] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | CH | 12.06.1991 | |
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | NL | 12.06.1991 | |
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | SE | 12.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4182935 (CHOWN MARTIN [GB]); | [A]EP0021199 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]EP0034107 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]US4294513 (NELSON DAVID E, et al); | [A]US4313192 (NELSON DAVID E, et al); | [A]US4375680 (CAHILL RICHARD F, et al); | [A]US4430572 (EVE MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]US4432599 (MCMAHON DONALD H [US]) | [Y] - RADIO AND ELECTRONIC ENGINEER, vol. 52, no. 6, June 1982, pages 283-290, Institution of Electronic and Radio Engineers, London, GB; B. CULSHAW: "Optical fibre transducers" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 16, no. 10, October 1983, pages 978-986, Dorking, GB; B. CULSHAW: "Optical systems and sensors for measurement and control" |