EP0194797 - Water reactor fuel element cladding tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/38] | Water reactor fuel cladding tubes | ||
[1989/50] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.01.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1995 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foster, John Paul 200 Londonderry Court Monroeville Pennsylvania / US | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301529.3 | 04.03.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | US19850709851 | 08.03.1985 Original published format: US 709851 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194797 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194797 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/06, B32B15/01 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
G21C3/07 (EP);
G21C3/16 (KR);
B32B15/01 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/38] | Title | German: | Hüllröhre für einen Brennstab eines wassergekühlten Reaktors | [1989/50] | English: | Water reactor fuel element cladding tube | [1989/50] | French: | Tube de gainage pour crayon combustible de réacteur refroidi à l'eau | [1989/50] |
Former [1986/38] | Hüllröhre für den Brennstoff eines wassergekühlten Reaktors | ||
Former [1986/38] | Water reactor fuel cladding tubes | ||
Former [1986/38] | Tube de gainage pour combustible d'un réacteur refroidi à l'eau | Examination procedure | 16.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.1990
24.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.1990
24.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 29.10.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.10.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121204 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]); | [AD]GB2119559 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE3310054 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US3620691 (RUBEL HARTMUT); | [A]DE1589458 (CA ATOMIC ENERGY LTD) |