EP0197669 - Racquets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIVERSIFIED PRODUCTS CORPORATION 309 Williamson Avenue Opelika, AL 36801 / US | [1986/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mott, Jonathan C. Old Forge Cottage The Common Wonersh Nr. Guildford Surrey, GU5 0PJ / GB | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Stoole, Brian David WesternGeco Intellectual Property Law Department Schlumberger House Buckingham Gate Gatwick West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Stoole, Brian David Schlumberger plc, Patent Department, 1 Kingsway, First Floor London WC2B 6XH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301771.1 | 12.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | GB19850006351 | 12.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8506351 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197669 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197669 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197669 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A63B49/10, A63B49/02 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B29C70/48 (EP,US);
A63B49/10 (EP,KR);
A63B49/11 (EP,US);
A63B60/00 (EP);
B29C70/865 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0205 (EP,US);
A63B2049/103 (EP,US);
A63B2209/023 (EP,US);
B29K2033/04 (EP,US);
B29L2031/5245 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Racket | [1986/42] | English: | Racquets | [1986/42] | French: | Raquette | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 12.03.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 12.03.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 12.03.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.09.1990 | IT | 12.09.1990 | SE | 12.09.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.09.1990 | |
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/50] | SE | 12.09.1990 | |
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 12.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | US3815660 [ ] (GALLAGHER P, et al); | US3874667 [ ] (GALLAGHER PETER CHRISTOPHER JO, et al); | DE1942082 [ ]; | DE2841412 [ ] (LO KUN NAN); | GB2148133 [ ] (MOTT JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER) |