EP0196191 - Method and apparatus for transforming prestel codes to naplps codes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonomura, Masashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301985.7 | 18.03.1986 | [1986/40] | Priority number, date | JP19850056333 | 20.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5633385 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196191 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196191 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196191 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/00, H04M11/08 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
H03M7/00 (EP,US);
H04M11/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/40] | H03M7/30, H04M11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Umsetzung eines Prestel-Kodes in einen NAPLPS-Kode | [1986/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for transforming prestel codes to naplps codes | [1986/40] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de conversion d'un code Prestel en un code NAPLPS | [1986/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/40] | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 10B, March 1984, pages 5588-5592, New York, US; C. CODRAI et al.: "Multiple line videotex adapter" | [A] - TELCOM REPORT, vol. 6, no. 6, December 1983, pages 360-364, Passau, DE; F. BRUNNER: "Realisierung eines mehrfunktionalen Multimode-Decoderkonzepts in der Bildschirmtextstation T3100" | [AP] - TELCOM REPORT, vol. 8, no. 6, November-December 1985, pages 382-386, Frankfurt, DE; N. GERNER et al.: "Internationale Videotex-Systeme" |