EP0203682 - Wavelength switched passive interferometric sensor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 360 North Crescent Drive Beverly Hills California 90210-9990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 360 North Crescent Drive Beverly Hills California 90210-9990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bush, Ira Jeffrey 8242 Blackburn Avenue Los Angeles California / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Rushton, Ronald, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | Rushton, Ronald, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302046.7 | 19.03.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | US19850738620 | 28.05.1985 Original published format: US 738620 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203682 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203682 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203682 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01H9/00 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G01H9/004 (EP,US);
G01J9/00 (KR);
G01D5/266 (EP,US);
G01D5/35303 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/49] | G01D5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Wellenlängengeschaltetes passives interferometrisches Sensorsystem | [1986/49] | English: | Wavelength switched passive interferometric sensor system | [1986/49] | French: | Capteur interférométrique passif à commutation par longueur d'onde | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 14.02.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.09.1991 | BE | 18.09.1991 | CH | 18.09.1991 | LI | 18.09.1991 | NL | 18.09.1991 | SE | 18.09.1991 | LU | 31.03.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/36] | AT | 18.09.1991 | |
BE | 18.09.1991 | ||
CH | 18.09.1991 | ||
LI | 18.09.1991 | ||
NL | 18.09.1991 | ||
SE | 18.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 18.09.1991 | |
CH | 18.09.1991 | ||
LI | 18.09.1991 | ||
NL | 18.09.1991 | ||
SE | 18.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | CH | 18.09.1991 | |
LI | 18.09.1991 | ||
NL | 18.09.1991 | ||
SE | 18.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/20] | CH | 18.09.1991 | |
LI | 18.09.1991 | ||
SE | 18.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | CH | 18.09.1991 | |
LI | 18.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0023345 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]GB2096762 (UNIV LONDON); | [X]US4360272 (SCHMADEL DONALD, et al); | [X]WO8500221 (GOULD INC [US]); | [XP]US4552457 (GIALLORENZI THOMAS G [US], et al); | [E]EP0192490 (ELDEC CORP [US]) | Examination | - "Coherence Multiplexing of Fiber-Optic Interferometric Sensors" by J.L. Brooks et al, Journal of Lightwave Technology, Vol. LT-3, No. 5, October 1985 |