EP0199509 - High temperature catalyst compositions for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 70 Wood Avenue South CN 770 Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 70 Wood Avenue South CN 770 Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung-Zong, Wan 10 Layne Road Somerset New Jersey / US | 02 /
Dettling, Joseph C. 8 Spicy Pond Road Howell New Jersey / US | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302704.1 | 11.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | US19850722905 | 12.04.1985 Original published format: US 722905 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199509 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199509 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199509 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/58, B01J23/56, B01J37/00, B01D53/36 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/44] | B01D53/36, B01J37/00, B01J23/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Katalysatorzusammensetzungen zur Anwendung bei hohen Temperaturen für Verbrennungsmotoren | [1986/44] | English: | High temperature catalyst compositions for internal combustion engine | [1986/44] | French: | Compositions de catalyseur utilisables à haute température pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4142993 [ ] (ELOFSON RICHARD M, et al); | US4170573 [ ] (ERNEST MICHAEL V [US], et al); | US4367162 [ ] (FUJITANI YOSHIYASU [JP], et al); | GB2142253 [ ] (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC) | Examination | US4392988 | EP0119715 |