EP0200471 - Process for preparing concrete mixtures and a liquid admixture therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, David A. 202 Helen Street Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Grenley, Dallas G. 2711 Georgetown Drive Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303071.4 | 23.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | US19850726536 | 24.04.1985 Original published format: US 726536 | US19850727657 | 26.04.1985 Original published format: US 727657 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200471 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200471 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B24/38, // (C04B28/04, 22:06, 24:02, 24:12, 24:12, 24:38, 24:42) | [1988/04] | CPC: |
C04B24/383 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B2103/30 (EP);
C04B2103/308 (EP);
C04B2103/50 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B22/062, C04B24/008, C04B24/02, C04B24/22, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B22/062, C04B24/008, C04B24/12, C04B24/22, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B40/0028 (EP) |
Former IPC [1986/45] | C04B28/04, // (C04B28/04, 22:06, 24:02, 24:12, 24:12, 24:38, 24:42) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Betonzusammensetzungen und ein flüssiges Gemisch dafür | [1986/45] | English: | Process for preparing concrete mixtures and a liquid admixture therefor | [1986/45] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de mélanges de béton et une mixture liquide pour de tels mélanges | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 08.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/13] | 04.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.08.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2314155 ; | [Y]FR1432930 ; | [X]DE1941576 ; | [A]WO8304279 ; | [AD]US4131480 |