EP0200503 - Packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1986/45] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence, Jack 21 Russell Square Longfield, Dartford Kent / GB | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303159.7 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | GB19850010849 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8510849 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200503 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200503 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65D69/00 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
B65D71/066 (EP,US);
B65D71/0096 (EP,US);
B65D71/04 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00018 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00037 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00043 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/45] | B65D71/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Verpackung | [1986/45] | English: | Packaging | [1986/45] | French: | Emballage | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 20.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 26.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2845691 (RIED HOLGER); | [Y]DE2910329 (EFFEM GMBH); | [A]DE8315958U (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [XP]EP0199336 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]DE8633285U |