EP0200504 - Compositions for sizing paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2016 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | ||
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states ALLIED COLLOIDS LIMITED P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langley, John 4 Wharfeldale Gardens Baildon Shipley West Yorkshire, BD17 6TM / GB | 02 /
Farrar, David 13 Greenfield Lane Idle Bradford West Yorkshire / GB | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2008/22] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1986/45] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303161.3 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | GB19850011379 | 03.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8511379 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0200504 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200504 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D21H3/02, C08J3/08 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
D21H17/375 (EP);
D21H17/15 (EP);
D21H17/42 (EP);
D21H17/43 (EP);
D21H17/455 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen für die Papierleimung | [1986/45] | English: | Compositions for sizing paper | [1986/45] | French: | Compositions pour l'encollage du papier | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 03.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1990
09.02.1995
INADMISSIBLE SNF Floerger 41, Rue Jean-Huss 42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/34] |
Former [1995/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1990
09.02.1995
INADMISSIBLE SNF Floerger 41, Rue Jean-Huss F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Sachsenkamstrasse 15 D-81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1990
SNF Floerger 41, Rue Jean-Huss F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Sachsenkamstrasse 15 D-81369 München / DE | 15.05.1990 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.1995 | GB | 25.04.1995 | SE | 26.04.1995 | BE | 30.04.1995 | CH | 30.04.1995 | LI | 30.04.1995 | NL | 01.11.1995 | FR | 29.12.1995 | DE | 03.01.1996 | IT | 25.04.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [1997/13] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
NL | 01.11.1995 | ||
FR | 29.12.1995 | ||
DE | 03.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
NL | 01.11.1995 | ||
FR | 29.12.1995 | ||
DE | 03.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
NL | 01.11.1995 | ||
DE | 03.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
NL | 01.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/20] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
NL | 01.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
GB | 25.04.1995 | ||
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 25.04.1995 | |
SE | 26.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 26.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP83120897 ; | [A]JP8447499 ; | [Y]USRE29960E ; | [Y]US4214948 (MALICZYSZYN WALTER [US], et al); | [A]US4435217 (HOUSE ROY F [US]); | [XPD]EP0141641 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) | [X] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 55, no. 3, September 1984, page 379, abstract no. 3581, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP - A - 83 120 897 (SEIKO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., HOKUETSU PAPER MFG. CO.) 18-07-1983, & JP83120897 A 00000000 | [A] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 55, no. 9, March 1985, pages 1088,1089, abstract no. 10308, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP - A - 84 47 499 (SEIKO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO.) 17-03-1984, & JP8447499 A 00000000 |