EP0203735 - A clutch and release bearing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banks, John David 18 Mullard drive Whitnash Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303331.2 | 01.05.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | GB19850013234 | 24.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8513234 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203735 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/75 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
F16D13/755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Zusammenbau eines Kupplungsausrücklagers | [1986/49] | English: | A clutch and release bearing assembly | [1986/49] | French: | Ensemble de palier de débrayage | [1986/49] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/31] | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/04] | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3376964 (ROOT ROBERT S); | [A]US3866733 (LINN DONALD F, et al); | [A]US4445600 (SCHMIDT FREDERICK C [US]); | [A]GB2096262 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD); | [A]DE3229052 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2244939 (LIPE ROLLWAY CORP [US]); | [A]FR2332457 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD [GB]) |