EP0206483 - Security control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pezzolo, Donald E. 12215 Colina Drive Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US | 02 /
Mitasev, Blazo A. 4863 Capistrano Avenue San Jose California 95129 / US | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303483.1 | 07.05.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | US19850744796 | 13.06.1985 Original published format: US 744796 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206483 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206483 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
G08B13/1418 (EP);
G08B13/00 (KR);
G08B25/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/52] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssteuerungssystem | [1986/52] | English: | Security control system | [1986/52] | French: | Système de contrôle de sécurité | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 20.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 20.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 02.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3925763 (WADHWANI ROMESH TEKCHAND, et al); | [Y]CA1116284 (SAGI GEORGE S); | [A]EP0095337 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]US3760397 (TAGGART J); | [A]US4367458 (HACKETT KENNETH R) |