EP0202904 - Plasma reactor with removable insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEGAL CORPORATION 11 Digital Drive Novato California 94947 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states TEGAL CORPORATION 11 Digital Drive Novato California 94947 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drage, David John 10660 Barnett Valley Road Sepastopol California 95472 / US | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303785.9 | 19.05.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | US19850736032 | 20.05.1985 Original published format: US 736032 | [1986/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0202904 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0202904 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202904 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H01J37/20, H01L21/00 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/67069 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/48] | H01J37/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/48] | Title | German: | Plasmareaktor mit entnehmbarem Einsatz | [1986/48] | English: | Plasma reactor with removable insert | [1986/48] | French: | Réacteur à plasma avec monture amovible | [1986/48] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 11.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Request for further processing for: | 02.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59132623 ; | [A]DE3214256 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 261 (E-281)[1698], 30th November 1984; & JP-A-59 132 623 (NIPPON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K.) 30-07-1984, & JP59132623 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0149089 |