EP0204465 - Production systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Masuaki Patent Div. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Yoji Patent Div. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Shinoda, Haruki Patent Div. Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/50] | Application number, filing date | 86303871.7 | 21.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | JP19850113791 | 27.05.1985 Original published format: JP 11379185 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204465 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204465 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204465 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/21 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G07C3/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5137 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/50] | Title | German: | Herstellungssysteme | [1986/50] | English: | Production systems | [1986/50] | French: | Systèmes de production | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3313481 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0142436 (SAULNIER DOMINIQUE); | [A]EP0141070 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2513411 (GARDOSI ERWIN [LU]); | [A]US4348276 (TATEISHI KAZUSHI, et al) | by applicant | JPS57106262 | US4807140 | DE3313481 |