EP0205276 - Making reinforced resinous sheet material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Composite Developments Limited Castle Chambers 43 Castle Street Liverpool L2 9TL / GB | [1986/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otty, Malcolm 9 Sycamore Rise Shaw Newbury Berkshire RG13 2LZ / GB | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303996.2 | 27.05.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | GB19850013609 | 30.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8513609 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205276 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205276 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/04, D04H5/02, B29C67/14 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
D04H3/004 (EP,US);
B29C70/083 (EP);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29C70/56 (EP);
D04H3/04 (EP);
D04H3/105 (EP);
D04H3/115 (EP);
B29K2105/0854 (EP);
B29K2105/101 (EP);
B29K2105/108 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/51] | D04H3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Herstellung einer verstärkten Kunststoffmaterialbahn | [1986/51] | English: | Making reinforced resinous sheet material | [1986/51] | French: | Fabrication de feuille de matière plastique renforcée | [1986/51] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/41] | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.1986 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | 27.06.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   05.08.1986 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3044146 (THOMAS JOHN H, et al); | [A]US3345230 (GEORGE MCCLEAN WILLIAM); | [A]GB2012671 (DUNLOP LTD); | [A]FR2455981 (BRITTON ARTHUR [GB]); | [A]US4318762 (MEYER LEONARD S); | [A]EP0091681 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK [JP]) |