EP0203829 - Supported photoinitiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bany, Stephen W. Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minn. 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Wood, Leigh E. Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minn. 55133-3427 / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86304133.1 | 30.05.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | US19850740231 | 31.05.1985 Original published format: US 740231 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203829 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203829 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203829 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/028 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
C08G59/68 (KR);
C08F4/00 (KR);
Y10S502/522 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/49] | G03C1/68 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/49] | Title | German: | Auf einem Träger aufgebrachter Photoinitiator | [1986/49] | English: | Supported photoinitiator | [1986/49] | French: | Photo-initiateur sur support | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 09.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3666743 (BOWER BARTON K, et al); | [Y]US4234732 (CRIVELLO JAMES V); | [Y]EP0014785 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]EP0094914 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0094915 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]US4220580 (ROWATT ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US4376191 (GECK REGINALD W); | [A]US4479858 (YATES RONALD L [US]) |