EP0204549 - Method of isolating antibiotic biosynthetic genes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Ramachandra Nagaraja 6818 Hoover Road Indianapolis Indiana 46260 / US | 02 /
Baltz, Richard Henry 7446 Sunset Lane Indianapolis Indiana 46260 / US | 03 /
Stanzak, Richard Kale Route 2 Box 286-c Poland Indiana 47868 / US | 04 /
Treadway, Patti Jean 2273 Horizon Boulevard Greenwood Indiana 46142 / US | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304239.6 | 04.06.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | US19850742349 | 07.06.1985 Original published format: US 742349 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204549 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204549 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204549 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12P19/62, C12N15/76, C12R1/465 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
C12N15/76 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/50] | C12N15/00, C12P19/62, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:465) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Isolierung von Genen zur Biosynthese von Antibiotika | [1986/50] | English: | Method of isolating antibiotic biosynthetic genes | [1986/50] | French: | Procédé d'isolement des gènes de biosynthèse d'antibiotiques | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.06.1994 | BE | 30.06.1994 | CH | 30.06.1994 | LI | 30.06.1994 | [1995/31] |
Former [1995/29] | SE | 05.06.1994 | |
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 30.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0173327 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP]); | [E]WO8703907 (LUBRIZOL GENETICS INC [US]) | [XP] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 3, March 1986, pages 229-232, New York, US; R. STANZAK et al.: "Cloning and expression in Streptomyces lividans of clustered erythromycin biosynthesis genes from streptomyces erythreus" | [A] - NATURE, vol. 309, no. 5967, May/June 1984, pages 462-464, London, GB; F. MALPARTIDA et al.: "Molecular cloning of the whole biosynthetic pathway of a Streptomyces antibiotic and its expression in a heterologous host" | [AP] - GENE, vol. 38, no. 1/3, 1985, pages 215-26, Elsevier Science Publishers, Amsterdam, NL; M.J. BIBB et al.: "Cloning and analysis of the promoter region of the erythromycin resistance gene (ermE) of Streptomyces erythraeus" | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 1, January 1984, pages 63-72; J.F. MARTIN et al.: "Cloning and expression of antibiotic production genes" | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, 1986, page 155, abstract no. 29785m, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.A. HOPWOOD et al.: "Cloning of antibiotic biosynthesis genes in Streptomyces", & GENET.: NEW FRONT., PROC. INT. CONGR., 15th 1983 (PUB. 1984). 2, 3-16 | [A] - GENE, vol. 20, 1982, pages 51-62, Elsevier Biomedical Press, ; C.J. THOMPSON et al.: "Physical analysis of antibiotic-resistance genes from Streptomyces and their use in vector construction" | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, 1986, page 169, abstract no. 184895m, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.A. HOPWOOD et al.: "Gene cloning to analyse the organization and expression of antibiotic biosynthesis genes in Streptomyces", & REGUL. SECOND. METAB. FORM., PROC. WORKSHOP CONF. HOECHST, 16TH 1985 (PUB. 1986), 23-33 | [A] - TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 1, no. 2, 1983, pages 42-48, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; D.A. HOPWOOD et al.: "Cloning Streptomyces genes for antibiotic production" | Examination | - GENE, vol. 20, 1982, pages 51-62, Elsevier Biomedical Press, ; C.J. THOMPSON et al.: "Physical analysis of antibiotic-resistance genes from Streptomyces and their use in vector construction" | - Mol. Gen. Genet 204 (1986) 532-539 | - Chater in: Microbiol Development, Cold Spring Harbor 1984, p.89-115 | - Hopwood and Chater in : Regulation of Secondary Metabolite formation, Proceedings of the Workshop May 12-16 (1985), 23-33 | by applicant | US4340674 | US4343906 | US4362816 | US4416994 | US4477571 | EP0176321 | - ISRAELI-RECHES ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1984), vol. 194, page 362 | - JONES ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, page 14158 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NATURE, (1980), vol. 286, page 525 | - SENO; BALTZ, ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1981), vol. 20, no. 3, page 370 | - TUDZYNSKI; ESSER, CURRENT GENETICS, (1982), vol. 5, page 227 | - DENTE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 11, page 1645 | - BALTZ; MATSUSHIMA, J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1981), vol. 127, page 137 | - BALTZ; MATSUSHIMA, J. GEN. MICROBIOLOGY, (1981), vol. 127, page 137 | US19840655178 | US19850742172 |