EP0207653 - Herbicidal compositions comprising microbial herbicides and chemical herbicides or plant growth regulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT AND STATE AGRICULTURAL COLLEGE 340 Waterman Building, University of Vermont Burlington, VT 05405 / US | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal PQ H3A 2T5 / CA | For all designated states Mycogen Corporation 5501 Oberlin Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT AND STATE AGRICULTURAL COLLEGE 340 Waterman Building, University of Vermont Burlington, VT 05405 / US | ||
For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal PQ H3A 2T5 / CA | |||
For all designated states Mycogen Corporation 5451 Oberlin Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states The University of Vermont Burlington Vermont 05405 / US | ||
For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal PQ H3A 2T5 / CA | |||
For all designated states Mycogen Corporation 5451 Oberlin Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caulder, Jerry D. 5875 Ciudad Leion Court San Diego California 92120 / US | 02 /
Gotleib, Alan R. 24 Brigham Hill Road Essex Junction Vermont 05452 / US | 03 /
Stowell, Larry 5448 La Jolla Hermosa Avenue San Diego California 92037 / US | 04 /
Watson, Alan K. 253 Normandy Pincourt Quebec Canada J7V 3V8 / US | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304384.0 | 09.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | US19850747511 | 21.06.1985 Original published format: US 747511 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207653 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/04, // (A01N63/04, 57:20, 47:36, 43:88, 43:653, 43:50, 43:40, 41:06, 39:02, 37:48, 37:30, 37:22, 37:10, 37:02, 35:10, 33:22) | [1987/02] | CPC: |
A01N63/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/30, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/30, A01N57/20, A01N47/36, A01N43/88, A01N43/653, A01N43/50, A01N43/40, A01N41/06, A01N39/02, A01N37/48, A01N37/30, A01N37/22, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/10, A01N33/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Herbizide Zusammensetzungen umfassend mikrobische Herbizide und chemische Herbizide oder Pflanzenwachstumsregulatoren | [1987/02] | English: | Herbicidal compositions comprising microbial herbicides and chemical herbicides or plant growth regulators | [1987/02] | French: | Compositions herbicides comprenant des agents microbiens herbicides et des agents chimiques herbicides ou régulateurs de la croissance des plantes | [1987/02] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/35] | 16.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/14] | 26.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3849104 (DANIEL J, et al); | [A]GB2007978 (MONTEDISON SPA); | [AD]US4390360 (WALKER HARRELL L); | [AD]US4419120 (WALKER HARRELL L [US]) | [X] - COMMONWEALTH AGRICULTURAL BUREAU, Slough, Bucks, GB; R.A. KLERK et al.: "Integration of a mycoherbicide with chemical pesticides for control of northern jointvetch (Aeschynomene virginica) in rice", & PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHERN WEED SCIENCE SOCIETY, 36th annual meeting, 1983, page 137 | [X] - COMMONWEALTH AGRICULTURAL BUREAU, Slough, Bucks, GB; P.C. QUIMBY Jr.: "Applying Alternaria cassiae to sicklepod", & PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHERN WEED SCIENCE SOCIETY, 36th annual meeting, 1983, pages 473,474 | [X] - COMMONWEALTH AGRICULTURAL BUREAU, Slough, Bucks, GB; R.A. KLERK et al.: "Interaction of pesticides with mycoherbicide CGA for the control of northern jointvetch in rice", & PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHERN WEED SCIENCE SOCIETY, 36th annual meeting, 1982, page 68 | [A] - BIOTECH 84, EUROPE PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE, 1984, pages 455-466, London, GB; S.G. LISANKSY: "Biological alternatives to chemical pesticides" | [A] - CHEMIE DER PFLANZENSCHUTZ- UND SCHÄDLINGS-BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL, vol. 6, 1981, pages 216-328, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; R. WEGLER: "Insektizide, Bakterizide, Oomyceten-Fungizide biochemische und biologische Methoden, Naturstoffe"; chapter 4: K. BAUER et al.: "Pflanzenschutzpräparate mikrobieller Herkunft" |