EP0211491 - Infrared ray heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikegami, Ryoichi 369-24, Aza-Ubakoyama Narumi-cho Midori-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Hitoshi 27-1 Okukomatsuzoroi Nawa-cho Tokai City Aichi Pref. / JP | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304659.5 | 17.06.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | JP19850120383U | 06.08.1985 Original published format: JP 12038385 U | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211491 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211491 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/26, F24C7/06 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
H05B3/30 (EP,US);
H05B3/10 (KR);
H05B3/20 (KR);
H05B3/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/09] | Title | German: | Infrarotheizkörper | [1987/09] | English: | Infrared ray heater | [1987/09] | French: | Radiateur à rayons infra-rouges | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1581129 [ ] (VULCAN REFRACTORIES LTD); | US3479490 [ ] (STARK NORMAN H); | DE2624729 [ ] (STEINMETZ MANFRIED); | DE2407619 [ ] (BLACK BODY CORP) | Examination | JPS6026194U |