EP0209286 - Static hydraulic continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | ||
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Tsutomu 3-8-16, Sumiyoshi-cho Hoya-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Mitsuru 1-8-6, Naka-cho Koganei-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Kazuhito 31-16-1105, Hon-cho Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Yoshihiro 4-24-13, Akatsuka Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305051.4 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | JP19850142253 | 28.06.1985 Original published format: JP 14225385 | JP19850157790 | 17.07.1985 Original published format: JP 15779085 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0209286 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209286 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16H39/10 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
F16H39/14 (EP,US);
F16H61/40 (EP,US);
F16H61/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/04] | Title | German: | Stufenloses hydrostatisches Getriebe | [1987/04] | English: | Static hydraulic continuously variable transmission | [1987/04] | French: | Transmission hydrostatique variable en continu | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 24.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE880989 [ ] (WEMHOENER DIETER); | GB1021873 [ ] (KUZE YOSHIKAZU); | US2844002 [ ] (FRANCO PAVESI); | DE1625039 [ ] (EATON YALE & TOWNE); | DE1480553 [ ] (WITTMEYER HELMUT); | CH473997 [ ] (USTAV PRO VYZKUM MOTOROVYCH VO [CZ]); | GB835936 [ ] (GUNNAR AXEL WAHLMARK); | GB902978 [ ] (FORD MOTOR CO); | US2907230 [ ] (KOLLMANN KARL A); | US3187868 [ ] (GANTZER CHARLES J); | US3543514 [ ] (REIMER LEONARD H); | JPS5938467 [ ] (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) | Examination | EP0001359 | GB1487608 | EP0186500 |