EP0208489 - High level microbial production of swine growth hormone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MINERALS AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 207 1401 South Third Street Terre Haute Indiana 47808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MINERALS AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 207 1401 South Third Street Terre Haute Indiana 47808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMullen, James R. 236 Van Buren Boulevard Terre Haute Indiana 47803 / US | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305052.2 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | US19850751976 | 28.06.1985 Original published format: US 751976 | [1987/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208489 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208489 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208489 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/18, C12P21/02 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
Y10S435/813 (EP,US);
Y10S435/818 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/03] | C12N15/00, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/03] | Title | German: | Mikrobiologische Herstellung eines Schweinewachstumshormons mit hoher Ausbeute | [1987/03] | English: | High level microbial production of swine growth hormone | [1987/03] | French: | Production à haut rendement d'une hormone de croissance de porc | [1987/03] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 02.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 12.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0104920 (BIOGEN NV [NL]); | [X]EP0131843 (BIO TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORP [US]); | [E]EP0209355 (INT MINERALS & CHEM CORP [US]) |