EP0208500 - Electrical contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BICC Public Limited Company Devonshire House Mayfair Place London W1X 5FH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states BICC Public Limited Company Devonshire House Mayfair Place London W1X 5FH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collier, John Covell Brampworth House Liverpool Road Skelmersdale Lancs / GB | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Gadsden, Robert Edward, et al BICC plc Group Patents & Licensing Dept. Network House 1, Ariel Way London W12 7SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Gadsden, Robert Edward, et al BICC plc Group Patents & Licensing Dept. Network House 1, Ariel Way London W12 7SL / GB | ||
Former [1987/03] | Gadsden, Robert Edward BICC Group Patents Department BICC Research & Engineering Limited 38 Ariel Way Wood Lane London W12 7DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305101.7 | 01.07.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | GB19850016610 | 01.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8516610 | [1987/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208500 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/09 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
H01R12/585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/03] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Kontakt | [1987/03] | English: | Electrical contact | [1987/03] | French: | Contact électrique | [1987/03] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 22.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/26] | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2937883 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0138309 (MANSKA WAYNE E); | [A]US4017143 (KNOWLES ROBERT GORDON); | [A]EP0125098 (BICC PLC [GB]); | [A]DE1615681 (AMP INC) |