EP0210010 - Construction transportation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robishaw, Alces Paul 9333 Memorial Lane Houston Texas 77024 / US | For all designated states Robishaw, Paul A. 10122 Meadow Lake Lane Houston Texas 77042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states Robishaw, Alces Paul 9333 Memorial Lane Houston Texas 77024 / US | ||
For all designated states Robishaw, Paul A. 10122 Meadow Lake Lane Houston Texas 77042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305209.8 | 04.07.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | US19850757631 | 22.07.1985 Original published format: US 757631 | [1987/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210010 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210010 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210010 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/38, E01D21/00, E02B17/00 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
E02B3/068 (EP,US);
B63B35/44 (KR);
B63B35/38 (EP,US);
B65D90/0026 (EP,US);
B65D90/12 (EP,US);
E01D15/133 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/05] | Title | German: | Transportierbares Konstruktionssystem | [1987/05] | English: | Construction transportation system | [1987/05] | French: | Système de construction transportable | [1987/05] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 23.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.10.1991 | FR | 16.10.1991 | IT | 16.10.1991 | NL | 16.10.1991 | [2006/32] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.10.1991 | |
IT | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 16.10.1991 | |
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | NL | 16.10.1991 | |
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 16.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3162320 (HITCH ROBERT A, et al); | [A]US3499179 (WELD ROBIN TRENCH); | [AD]US3805721 (ROBISHAW A); | [A]US3983830 (MORGAN GEORGE W); | [X]EP0128976 (BARGECO AG [CH]); | [AE]EP0175446 (ROBISHAW ENG INC [US]); | [XE]EP0192481 (ROBISHAW ALCES P [US], et al) | [A] - POLYTECHNISCH TIJDSCHRIFT - BOUWKUNDE WEGEN- EN WATERBOUW, vol. 33, no. 12, December 1978, page 20, Den Haag, NL; "Flexifloat advertisement" |