EP0212825 - Flame-retardant olefin polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Takashi 29-330 Nagahama Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sunada, Masazi 7-8-11 Nagatsuda Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Motohide 3-35-2 Ohkubo Konan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kariya, Masayoshi 3-35-2 Ohkubo Konan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Inoh, Tadashi 2-3 Nakasaiwaicho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86305298.1 | 09.07.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | JP19850149211 | 09.07.1985 Original published format: JP 14921185 | JP19860068745 | 28.03.1986 Original published format: JP 6874586 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0212825 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0212825 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212825 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08L51/06, C08K3/00 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US);
C08L2201/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/0869, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/10] | Title | German: | Feuerhemmende Polyolefinzusammensetzung | [1987/10] | English: | Flame-retardant olefin polymer composition | [1987/10] | French: | Composition de polyoléfine ignifugée | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2253784 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0009254 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [X]EP0082407 (AEG TELEFUNKEN KABELWERKE [DE], et al); | [A]EP0131358 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [XP]EP0160777 (CABLES DE LYON GEOFFROY DELORE [FR]) |