EP0214725 - High impact strength powder metal part and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM METAL PRODUCTS INC. 11000 Cedar Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states SCM METAL PRODUCTS INC. 11000 Cedar Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44106 / US | ||
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states SCM CORPORATION 925 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svilar, Mark 2251 Brockway University Heights Ohio / US | 02 /
Glancy, Stephan 749 Montana Avenue Akron Ohio / US | 03 /
Klar, Erhard 2477 Brian Drive Beachwood Ohio / US | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/12] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86305440.9 | 15.07.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | US19850755282 | 15.07.1985 Original published format: US 755282 | US19860866184 | 20.05.1986 Original published format: US 866184 | US19860879502 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: US 879502 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214725 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214725 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C22C33/02, B22F3/26 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
C22C33/0242 (EP);
B22F2998/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, F16C7/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Pulvermetallkörper mit hoher Kerbschlagzähigkeit und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1987/12] | English: | High impact strength powder metal part and method for making same | [1987/12] | French: | Article en poudre métallique ayant une résilience élevée, et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.1992 | BE | 15.01.1992 | CH | 15.01.1992 | FR | 15.01.1992 | IT | 15.01.1992 | LI | 15.01.1992 | NL | 15.01.1992 | SE | 15.01.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 15.01.1992 | |
BE | 15.01.1992 | ||
CH | 15.01.1992 | ||
IT | 15.01.1992 | ||
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
NL | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
FR | 05.06.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.01.1992 | |
BE | 15.01.1992 | ||
CH | 15.01.1992 | ||
IT | 15.01.1992 | ||
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
NL | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
FR | 05.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 15.01.1992 | |
BE | 15.01.1992 | ||
CH | 15.01.1992 | ||
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
NL | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
FR | 05.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | BE | 15.01.1992 | |
CH | 15.01.1992 | ||
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
NL | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 15.01.1992 | |
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
NL | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 15.01.1992 | |
LI | 15.01.1992 | ||
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 15.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2157563 (BRICO ENG); | [X]US4491558 (GARDNER RICHARD N [US]) | [X] - E. KLAR: "Metals handbook", 9th edition, vol. 7, Powder metallurgy, 1984, pages 557-559, American Society for Metals, Ohio, US; |