EP0211554 - Digital bus control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1994 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | 10.06.1994 | Change - revocation of patent | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mogi, Takao c/o Sony Corporation - 7-35 Kitashinagava 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Keiji, Yuzawa c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshinori, Komiya c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Masayuki, Suematsu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Fujio, Tanoue c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/45] |
Former [1987/09] | 01 /
Mogi, Takao Takao, Mogi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Keiji, Yuzawa c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshinori, Komiya c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Masayuki, Suematsu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Fujio, Tanoue c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305547.1 | 18.07.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | JP19850161004 | 20.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16100485 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0211554 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0211554 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211554 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/20, H04N5/44 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04B1/20 (KR);
H04B1/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/09] | Title | German: | Digitales Buskontrollsystem | [1987/09] | English: | Digital bus control system | [1987/09] | French: | Système de contrôle d'une ligne à bus numérique | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.08.1992
14.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Gornott, Dietmar Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.08.1992
14.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Gornott, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Zilleweg 29 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | 16.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.03.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56145443 ; | [X]JP56145452 ; | [X]JP56145454 ; | [X]US3984819 (ANDERSON GEORGE A); | [X]US4456965 (GRABER WARREN S [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 27 (P-102)[905], 17th February 1982; & JP-A-56 145 443 (PANA FACOM K.K.) 12-11-1981, & JP56145443 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 27 (P-102)[905], 17th February 1982; & JP-A-56 145 452 (PANA FACOM K.K.) 12-11-1981, & JP56145452 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 27 (P-102)[905], 17th February 1982; & JP-A-56 145 454 (PANA FACOM K.K.) 12-11-1981, & JP56145454 A 00000000 | by applicant | JPS57106262 |