EP0210864 - Variable speed transaxle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Page, Rocky Hudson 1005 River Acres Drive Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | 02 /
Von Kaler, Roland Ludwig 9402 Pleasant Drive Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305837.6 | 29.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | US19850759679 | 29.07.1985 Original published format: US 759679 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210864 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/72 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
F16H37/0846 (EP,US);
F16H3/72 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
Y10S475/90 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/06] | Title | German: | Stufenloses Achsgetriebe | [1987/06] | English: | Variable speed transaxle assembly | [1987/06] | French: | Essieu de transmission continue | [1987/06] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1987/42: Divisional application 87201555 filed on 17.08.87 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP87201555.7 / EP0257704 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH250459 [ ] (KOELLA KARL [CH]); | US2933952 [ ] (SCHOU CARL E); | US3038288 [ ] (DEPTULA FRANK J, et al); | FR1544765 [ ]; | US3628315 [ ] (BARTHOLOMEW ROBERT W); | US3863514 [ ] (JENSEN STANLEY W); | DE2518113 [ ]; | US4128017 [ ] (CLARKE GEORGE C); | DE2733294 [ ]; | US4224839 [ ] (VON KALER ROLAND L); | US4232569 [ ] (HAUSER HANS, et al); | DE3020510 [ ] (WINKLER REINHARD); | US4484491 [ ] (COCKING HARRY [GB]) | [T] - HUGO KLEIN"Die Planetenrad-Umlaufradergetriebe"; CARL HANSER VERLAG, Munchen 1962, pages 175,193-200 |