EP0224319 - Stable silanol priming solution for use in dentistry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Culler, Scott R. Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Rauh, Peter, et al Vossius & Partner postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Rauh, Peter A., Dr., et al Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/23] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86305947.3 | 01.08.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | US19850782428 | 01.10.1985 Original published format: US 782428 | [1987/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224319 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224319 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
A61K6/76 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L25/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/14 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/23] | Title | German: | Stabiles Silanolhaftgrundmittel zur Verwendung in der Zahnheilkunde | [1987/23] | English: | Stable silanol priming solution for use in dentistry | [1987/23] | French: | Solution stable d'apprêt à base de silanol pour utilisation en dentisterie | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1986 | Request for decision received: division | 03.12.1986 | Result of request for decision (division): Request rejected | 30.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 02.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 26.01.1987 | Appeal received No. J0015/87 | 26.03.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.01.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1988/04] | 11.02.1988 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/07] | 16.03.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal withdrawn | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1992
01.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Ivoclar AG Bendererstr. 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI Opponents representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.1992
01.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Ivoclar AG Bendererstr. 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI Opponents representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | 07.12.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.09.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/44] | Appeal following opposition | 28.02.1995 | Appeal received No. T0190/95 | 06.06.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.07.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.1998 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.1995 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 29.01.1992 | |
LI | 29.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3369297 (DAVID HALPERN BENJAMIN, et al); | [Y]US4315970 (MCGEE JAMES B) | [YD] - E.P. PLUEDDEMANN: "Silane coupling agents", 1982, pages 49-73, chapter 3, "Aqueous solutions of silane coupling agents", Plenum Press, New York, US; |