EP0214758 - Polymerisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1987/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Alan Stuart "Kismet" George Green Road George Green Slough Berks / GB | 02 /
Butterworth, Stephen John 16 Hivings Park Chesham Bucks / GB | 03 /
Jheeta, Ravinder Kaur 585 Bath Road Slough Berks / GB | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Beton, John Lonsdale, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Beton, John Lonsdale, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1990/36] | James, David Gomer Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1987/12] | Johnston, Walter Paul Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough SL2 5DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306028.1 | 05.08.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | GB19850022052 | 05.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8522052 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214758 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214758 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214758 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/32 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
C08F2/32 (EP,KR,US);
C09K23/017 (EP,US);
Y10S516/01 (EP,US);
Y10S526/911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Polymerisationsverfahren | [1987/12] | English: | Polymerisation process | [1987/12] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1991 | BE | 17.04.1991 | CH | 17.04.1991 | LI | 17.04.1991 | SE | 17.04.1991 | LU | 31.08.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/18] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
BE | 17.04.1991 | ||
CH | 17.04.1991 | ||
LI | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
CH | 17.04.1991 | ||
LI | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/02] | CH | 17.04.1991 | |
LI | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/48] | SE | 17.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58019304 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 10, September 1983, page 30, abstract no. 71596d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 019 304 (OKURA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD) 04-02-1983, & JP58019304 A 00000000 |