EP0218329 - Apparatus for controlling anode movement in aluminium reduction cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tremblay, Jean-Pierre Lionel 2308 d'Ortona Arvida Quebec G7S 1C6 / CA | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306112.3 | 07.08.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | GB19850021128 | 23.08.1985 Original published format: GB 8521128 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218329 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218329 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/20 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
C25C3/20 (EP,US);
C25B15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1987/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Anodenbewegung in Aluminium-Reduktionszellen | [1987/16] | English: | Apparatus for controlling anode movement in aluminium reduction cells | [1987/16] | French: | Appareillage pour piloter le déplacement des anodes dans des cellules électrolytiques pour la production de l'aluminium | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB602876 (COMPAGNIEDE PROD CHIM ET ELECT); | [A]FR2013358 (BAYER AG); | [A]US3817846 (GEBAUER W, et al); | [A]US3994797 (SMITH SAM L); | [YD]EP0086593 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) |