EP0213810 - Continuous annealing and pickling method and apparatus for steel strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | [1987/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Norio c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | 02 /
Yanagishima, Fumiya c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | 03 /
Kaihara, Toshikazu c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | 04 /
Kishida, Akira c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | 05 /
Sato, Kuniaki c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | 06 /
Ochiai, Masanobu c/o Chiba Works Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasaki-Cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al HASELTINE, LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306114.9 | 07.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | JP19850173134 | 08.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17313485 | JP19860149782 | 27.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14978286 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213810 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213810 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/52, C21D9/56, C25F1/06 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
C21D9/52 (EP,US);
C21D9/561 (EP,US);
C25F1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Glühen und Beizen von Stahlbändern im Durchlaufverfahren | [1987/11] | English: | Continuous annealing and pickling method and apparatus for steel strips | [1987/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le recuit et le décapage en continu de rubans d'acier | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 04.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2045392 (KIENTZ JR JOSEPH C); | [A]EP0106166 (ITALIMPIANTI [IT]); | [A]GB2082206 (LYSAGHT AUSTRALIA LTD); | [A]US1704015 (NAUGLE HARRY M, et al); | [A]US3826693 (FISHER T) | [X] - METALLURGIA, vol. 76, no. 458, December 1967, pages 233-237, Manchester, GB: "Bright annealing stainless steel strip" | Examination | - Metals Handbook 9th Ed; vol. 4 , Heat Treating , p.402-407 | - Metals Handbook 9th Ed, vol.5, Surface Cleaning, Finishing & Coating p.76 | - " The Making, Shaping and Treating of Steel ", 9th Ed; (1971), p.977., Ed. by Harald E. McCannar. |