EP0213826 - Semiconductor laser device and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuzawa, Tadashi 23-2, Kyodo-3-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Chinone, Naoki 47-3, Akatsukicho-1-chome Hachioji-shi / JP | 03 /
Nakatsuka, Shin'Ichi 14-6, Nishikoigakubo-4-chome Kokubunji-shi / JP | 04 /
Saito, Katsutoshi 19-14, Nangai-2-chome Higashiyamoto-shi / JP | 05 /
Kajimura, Takashi 2196-251, Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ono, Yuuichi 2196-288, Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1987/11] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306177.6 | 11.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | JP19850175823 | 12.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17582385 | JP19850199417 | 11.09.1985 Original published format: JP 19941785 | JP19850226720 | 14.10.1985 Original published format: JP 22672085 | JP19850247018 | 06.11.1985 Original published format: JP 24701885 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213826 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213826 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19, H01L33/00 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/16 (EP,US);
H01S5/20 (EP,US);
H01S5/34 (EP,US);
H01S5/1064 (EP,US);
H01S5/2059 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/11] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaservorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1987/11] | English: | Semiconductor laser device and method of fabricating the same | [1987/11] | French: | Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/11] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/11] | 15.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59202677 ; | [A]FR2534078 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0115390 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]JPS6079785 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) | [AD] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 24, no. 7, July 1985, pages L548-L550, Tokyo, JP; S. SEMURA et al.: "AlGaAs/GaAs multiquantum well lasers with buried multiquantum well optical guide" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 65 (E-304) [1788], 26th March 1985; & JP-A-59 202 677 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN (JAPAN)) 16-11-84, & JP59202677 A 00000000 | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 46, no. 9, 1st May 1985, pages 849,850, American Institute of Physics, Woodbury, New York, US; M. KAWABE et al.: "Effects of Be and Si on disordering of the AlAs/GaAs superlattice" |