EP0212939 - Method for controlling mollusks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETZ EUROPE, INC. 4636 Somerton Road Trevose Pennsylvania 19047 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states BETZ EUROPE, INC. 4636 Somerton Road Trevose Pennsylvania 19047 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Dwight Preston 4 Bucks Meadow Lane Newtown Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 02 /
Lyons, Larry Albert 320 Briarhill Lane Woodbury New Jersey 08096 / US | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Gore, Peter Manson, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Gore, Peter Manson, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306246.9 | 13.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | US19850765622 | 14.08.1985 Original published format: US 765622 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0212939 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0212939 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212939 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/50 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
Y10S210/931 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bekämpfung von Mollusken | [1987/10] | English: | Method for controlling mollusks | [1987/10] | French: | Procédé pour la lutte contre les mollusques | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3898343 (SWERED PAUL, et al); | [A]US4447411 (LANGDON CHRISTOPHER J [US]); | [YPD]US4561983 (DAVIS DWIGHT P [US], et al) |