EP0219939 - Power-assisted rack and pinion steering gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westercamp, Kenneth Lee 9797 East Townline Road Frankenmuth Michigan 48734 / US | 02 /
Kurecka, Donald Joseph 3114 Wintegreen West Saginaw Michigan 48603 / US | 03 /
Yeack, David Craig 11120 Alscot Lane Whitehouse Ohio 43571 / US | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1987/18] | Breakwell, John Neil Bower GM Patent Section Vauxhall Motors Limited Luton Office (F6) P.O. Box No. 3 Kimpton Road Luton Bedfordshire LU2 OSY / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306366.5 | 18.08.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | US19850776128 | 13.09.1985 Original published format: US 776128 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219939 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219939 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
B62D5/0427 (EP,US);
B62D5/0448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/18] | Title | German: | Hilfskraftverstärkte Zahnstangenlenkung | [1987/18] | English: | Power-assisted rack and pinion steering gear | [1987/18] | French: | Direction assistée à pignon et crémaillère | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 25.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0133003 (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]); | [AD]US4415054 (DRUTCHAS GILBERT H [US]) |