EP0216505 - Polyimides, preparation of polyimides and blends of polyimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hallden-Abberton, Michael Paul 964 Whitney Lane Maple Glen Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 02 /
Bortnick, Newman Mayer 509 Oreland Mill Road Oreland Pennsylvania 19075 / US | 03 /
Cohen, Leslie Alan 2550 Creek Road Langhorne Pennsylvania 19047 / US | 04 /
Fromuth, Harry Charles, Jr. 904 Sterner Mill Road Trevose Pennsylvania 19047 / US | 05 /
Freed, William Thayer RD No. 1, Box E 323 Stockton New Jersey 08559 / US | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306474.7 | 21.08.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | US19850770034 | 27.08.1985 Original published format: US 770034 | [1987/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216505 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216505 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216505 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
C08G73/10 (KR);
C08L101/02 (EP,US);
C08L33/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/32, C08F20/12 (EP,US);
C08L101/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L33/24, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/14] | Title | German: | Polyimide, Herstellung von Polyimiden und Polyimidzusammensetzungen | [1987/14] | English: | Polyimides, preparation of polyimides and blends of polyimides | [1987/14] | French: | Polyimides, préparation de polyimides et compositions de polyimides | [1987/14] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60020904 ; | [YD]US3284425 (GUNTER SCHRODER, et al); | [A]FR2393818 (GAF CORP [US]); | [YD]US4246374 (KOPCHIK RICHARD M); | [AD]EP0076691 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [A]FR2528435 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 2, July 1985, abstract no. 6894m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 020 904 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO. LTD) 02-02-1985, & JP60020904 A 00000000 |