EP0219211 - Circuit breaker with replaceable rating plug interlock and push to trip button [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimp, Alan Burke 1022 Harvard Road Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 02 /
Beatty, William Ellsworth, Jr. RD. No.1, Park Road Beaver Pennsylvania 15009 / US | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306635.3 | 28.08.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | US19850771376 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: US 771376 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219211 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219211 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219211 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/10, H01H71/74 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
H01H71/525 (EP,US);
H01H31/00 (KR);
H01H71/123 (EP,US);
H01H71/128 (EP,US);
H01H2071/508 (EP,US);
H01H71/7409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/17] | Title | German: | Schutzschalter mit einer Taste für die Auslösung und für die Verriegelung eines Auswechselbaren Kalibrierungsteckers | [1987/17] | English: | Circuit breaker with replaceable rating plug interlock and push to trip button | [1987/17] | French: | Disjoncteur avec poussoir de déclenchement et de verrouillage d'une fiche de calibrage remplaçable | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3826951 (MATER A, et al); | [X]US4298852 (MAIER ALFRED E, et al); | [X]GB2091505 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [X]US4037184 (KEMPISTY JR FRANCIS W, et al); | [A]US3986155 (KOSUP RUSSELL R) |