EP0214833 - High-resolution radiation image detecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMADZU CORPORATION 378, Ichinofunairi-cho Kawaramachi-dori Nijo Sagaru Nakagyo-ku Kyoto 604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states SHIMADZU CORPORATION 378, Ichinofunairi-cho Kawaramachi-dori Nijo Sagaru Nakagyo-ku Kyoto 604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiri, Motosada 14-11, 6-chome Ooe Nishi Shinbayashi-cho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto 610-11 / JP | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306790.6 | 02.09.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | JP19850194091 | 02.09.1985 Original published format: JP 19409185 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214833 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214833 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214833 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, A61B6/00 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
H04N23/30 (EP,KR);
H05G1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1987/12] | Title | German: | Hochauflösende Strahlungsbilderfassungsvorrichtung | [1987/12] | English: | High-resolution radiation image detecting apparatus | [1987/12] | French: | Appareil de détection d'image de radiation à haute résolution | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4247780 (WEBBER RICHARD L, et al); | [A]GB2101444 (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]); | [AP]FR2565053 (THOMSON CGR [FR]) | by applicant | US4247780 |