EP0215618 - Ion sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proudfoot, Gary 24 Ardington Wantage Oxfordshire / GB | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Wood, Paul Austin Patents Department AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Wood, Paul Austin United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Patents Department Building 329 Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306874.8 | 05.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | GB19850022976 | 17.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8522976 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0215618 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0215618 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/02, H01J37/08 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J27/022 (EP,US);
H01J27/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1987/13] | Title | German: | Ionenquellen | [1987/13] | English: | Ion sources | [1987/13] | French: | Sources d'ions | [1987/13] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 19.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/41] | 18.05.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1989 | 01.10.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2317738 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4346301 (ROBINSON WILLIAM P, et al); | [A]EP0139377 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) |