EP0215626 - Systems and methods for ion source control in ion implanters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara California 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plumb, Frederick 2 Dickens Way Horsham West Sussex / GB | 02 /
Wright, Christopher 3 Holmcroft Gardens Findon, West Sussex / GB | 03 /
Bright, Nicholas John 25 Acorn Avenue Cowfold, West Sussex / GB | 04 /
Aitken, Derek The Coach House, Capel Leyse, Moorhurst Lane South Holmwood, Dorking, Surrey / GB | 05 /
Harrison, Bernard 3 Beechey Close Crawley / GB | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306924.1 | 08.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | US19850774110 | 09.09.1985 Original published format: US 774110 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0215626 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0215626 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215626 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/317, H01J37/08, H01J37/24, H01J27/14 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
H01J37/24 (EP,US);
H01J27/022 (EP,US);
H01J27/14 (EP,US);
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J37/3171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Ionenquelle in Ionen-Implantierungsgeräten | [1987/13] | English: | Systems and methods for ion source control in ion implanters | [1987/13] | French: | Dispositifs et procédés de contrôle de la source d'ions dans les implanteurs ioniques | [1987/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 24.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.1991 | BE | 12.06.1991 | CH | 12.06.1991 | FR | 12.06.1991 | IT | 12.06.1991 | LI | 12.06.1991 | NL | 12.06.1991 | SE | 12.06.1991 | GB | 12.09.1991 | LU | 30.09.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
IT | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
GB | 12.09.1991 | ||
LU | 30.09.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
IT | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
GB | 12.09.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1993/13] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
GB | 12.09.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/18] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
BE | 12.06.1991 | ||
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 12.06.1991 | |
CH | 12.06.1991 | ||
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | CH | 12.06.1991 | |
LI | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | NL | 12.06.1991 | |
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | SE | 12.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4424448 (TAKIGAWA TADAHIRO [JP], et al) | [A] - INSTRUMENTS AND EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES, vol. 25, no. 3, part 2, May/June 1982, pages 673-677, Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, US; A.N. BRYUKHANOV et al.: "Power supply for gas-discharge ion source" | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, Section B, vol. B6, no. 1/2, January 1985, pages 146-153, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; O. WOODARD et al.: "Computer automation of high current ion implanters" |