EP0264499 - Sulfonated poly(aryl ether) resins and intermediate silyl sulfonate derivatives; methods of making them, and membranes formed from the resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION (an Indiana corp.) 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION (an Indiana corp.) 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | ||
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chao, Herbert Shin-I 7 Lake Drive Apt. 2-A Watervlier New York 12189 / US | 02 /
Kelsey, Donald Ross 490 Auten Road 4B, Hillsborough New Jersey 08876 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307193.2 | 18.09.1986 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0264499 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264499 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/23, C08G65/48, C08J5/22 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
C08G65/4012 (EP);
B01D71/52 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP);
C08G65/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Sulfonierte Polyaryletherharze und intermediäre Silylsulfonat-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und aus den Harzen hergestellte Membrane | [1988/17] | English: | Sulfonated poly(aryl ether) resins and intermediate silyl sulfonate derivatives; methods of making them, and membranes formed from the resins | [1988/17] | French: | Résines de poly(éther d'arylène)sulfonés et dérivés intermédiaires silylsulfonés, procédés pour leur préparation et membranes formées à partir de ces résines | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1987 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.1990 | BE | 01.08.1990 | CH | 01.08.1990 | IT | 01.08.1990 | LI | 01.08.1990 | NL | 01.08.1990 | SE | 01.08.1990 | LU | 30.09.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
SE | 01.08.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/32] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
CH | 01.08.1990 | ||
LI | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 01.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3709841 (QUENTIN J); | [AD]US3875096 (GRAEFE ALLEN F, et al); | [A]DE2558391 (RHONE POULENC IND); | [A]EP0139061 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) |