EP0221661 - Pressure indicating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove, New York 11542 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove New York 11542 / US | ||
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove New York 11542 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silverwater, Bernard 72 Mitchell Avenue Plainview New York 11803 / US | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307313.6 | 23.09.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | US19850781222 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: US 781222 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0221661 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0221661 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221661 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/14 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
G01L19/12 (EP,US);
Y10S116/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1987/20] | Title | German: | Druckanzeiger | [1987/20] | English: | Pressure indicating device | [1987/20] | French: | Dispositif indicateur de pression | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3335863 (SILVERWATER BERNARD F); | [A]US3125062 ; | [A]US3216571 (WHITING JAMES C, et al); | [A]US3187711 (CAMPOLONG JOSEPH F) |