EP0217636 - Method and apparatus for improving adhesion of a railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shigeura, Junichi Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Works No. 1-1 Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Isoda, Noriyuki Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Works No. 1-1 Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Nobuyoshi Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Itami Works No. 1-1 Tsukaguchihonmachi 8-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307366.4 | 25.09.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | JP19850219400 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21940085 | JP19860085787 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8578786 | JP19860116700 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: JP 11670086 | JP19860116701 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: JP 11670186 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217636 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217636 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217636 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61C15/10 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
B61C15/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI [1987/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Haftung von Schienenfahrzeugen | [1987/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for improving adhesion of a railway vehicle | [1987/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer l'adhésion des véhicules ferroviaires | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1387451 (BRITISH RAILWAYS BOARD); | [Y]US1404903 (CHARLES SPENCER); | [A]DE3402502 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2181804 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L); | [A]US3020071 (THOMAS MAKINSON) |