EP0223365 - Cefuroxime axetil dragee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anwar, Jamshed 9 De Vere Gardens Ilford Essex / GB | 02 /
Deutsch, David Samuel 24 Sneath Avenue London NW11 / GB | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307459.7 | 29.09.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | GB19850024001 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8524001 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223365 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223365 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223365 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/545, A61K9/36, A61K9/30 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/545 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2004 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/22] | A61K31/545, A61K9/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL, SE [1987/22] | Title | German: | Cefuroximaxetil-Dragee | [1987/22] | English: | Cefuroxime axetil dragee | [1987/22] | French: | Dragée contenant du céfuroxime axétil | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT338431B [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | US4143129 [ ] (MARSDEN RICHARD); | GB1560854 [ ] (SHIONOGI & CO, et al); | GB1571683 [ ] (GLAXO OPERATIONS LTD); | US4302440 [ ] (JOHN PHILLIP M, et al); | GB2127401 [ ] (GLAXO GROUP LTD); | EP0147780 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |